Text: H.R.3780 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/08/2009)


111th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 3780


To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to extend the first-time homebuyer tax credit for members of the Armed Forces and certain Federal employees serving on extended duty.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

October 8, 2009

Mr. Maffei introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Ways and Means


A BILL

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to extend the first-time homebuyer tax credit for members of the Armed Forces and certain Federal employees serving on extended duty.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Service Members’ Homebuyer Tax Credit Extension Act 2009”.

SEC. 2. Extension of first-time homebuyer credit for individuals on qualified official extended duty.

(a) In general.—Subsection (h) of section 36 of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 is amended—

(1) by striking “This section” and inserting the following:

“(1) IN GENERAL.—This section”, and

(2) by adding at the end the following new paragraph:

“(2) SPECIAL RULE FOR QUALIFIED EXTENDED DUTY.—

“(A) IN GENERAL.—In the case of an individual who serves on qualified official extended duty outside the United States for at least 180 days in calendar year 2009—

“(i) paragraph (1) shall be applied by substituting ‘December 1, 2010’ for ‘December 1, 2009’,

“(ii) subparagraph (D) of subsection (f)(4) shall be applied by substituting ‘December 1, 2010’ for ‘December 1, 2009’, and

“(iii) in the case of a purchase of a principal residence after December 31, 2009, and before December 1, 2010, the taxpayer may elect to treat such purchase as made on December 31, 2009, for purposes of this section (other than subsections (c) and (f)(4)(D)).

“(B) QUALIFIED OFFICIAL EXTENDED DUTY.—For purposes of subparagraph (A), the term ‘qualified official extended duty’ means qualified official extended duty (as defined in section 121(d))—

“(i) as a member of the uniformed services,

“(ii) as a member of the Foreign Service of the United States, or

“(iii) as an employee of the intelligence community.

Any term used in the preceding sentence which is also used in paragraph (9) of section 121(d) shall have the same meaning as when used in such paragraph.”.

(b) Conforming amendment.—Paragraph (4) of section 1400C(e) of such Code is amended by striking “December 1, 2009” and inserting “December 31, 2009”.

(c) Effective date.—The amendments made by this section shall apply to purchases made after November 30, 2009.