Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 10/08/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2]* 10/08/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 10/22/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/03/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 11/18/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/22/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/23/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/04/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/09/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/10/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/15/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/23/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/14/2010
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 05/06/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/20/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/20/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/28/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 08/10/2010