Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/14/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 10/14/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 10/20/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 10/20/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 10/20/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 10/20/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/20/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 10/20/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 10/20/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 10/20/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 10/20/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 10/20/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 10/20/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/20/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 10/20/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 10/20/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 10/20/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/20/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 10/20/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/20/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 10/20/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 10/20/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/22/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 10/22/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 10/27/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/28/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 10/28/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 11/18/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/23/2010