Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 10/13/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/14/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/14/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/14/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 10/14/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 10/14/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/14/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/14/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 10/14/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/15/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 10/15/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 10/15/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/20/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/20/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 10/20/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/21/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 10/27/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/02/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 11/02/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/02/2009
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 11/02/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 11/04/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/04/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/04/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 11/04/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/04/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 11/04/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/04/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 11/04/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/04/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/04/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 11/04/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/04/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 11/04/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 11/04/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/04/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/04/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/04/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 11/04/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/04/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/04/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/04/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 11/04/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/04/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/04/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 11/04/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 11/06/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/06/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/06/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 11/06/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/06/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/06/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/06/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 11/06/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 11/06/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 11/06/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/06/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/06/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/06/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/06/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/06/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 11/06/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 11/06/2009