There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Emergency Senior Citizens Relief Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To extend certain economic recovery payments, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/14/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
10/15/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
10/14/2009Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
Action By: House of Representatives
10/14/2009Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
Action By: House of Representatives
10/14/2009Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
10/14/2009Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/14/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 10/14/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 10/14/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 10/14/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 10/14/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 10/14/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 10/14/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 10/14/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 10/14/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 10/14/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 10/14/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 10/14/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 10/14/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 10/14/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 10/14/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 10/14/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/15/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/15/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/15/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/15/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/21/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/21/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/21/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/21/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 10/21/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/21/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/22/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/26/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/26/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/27/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/29/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/17/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/09/2009
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/22/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 02/24/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 02/26/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/23/2010

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means10/14/2009 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure10/14/2009 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials10/15/2009 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs10/14/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3810. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/14/2009)

Emergency Senior Citizens Relief Act of 2009 - Amends the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009 to extend the $250 economic recovery payment payable to certain individuals through calendar year 2010.

Applies the Old Age, Survivors, and Disability Insurance tax in 2010 to certain earnings in excess of $1.29 million.