Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 10/14/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 10/14/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 10/14/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 10/14/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 10/14/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 10/14/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 10/14/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 10/14/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 10/14/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 10/14/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 10/14/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 10/14/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 10/14/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 10/14/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 10/14/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/15/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/15/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/15/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/15/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/21/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/21/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/21/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/21/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 10/21/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/21/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/22/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/26/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/26/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/27/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/29/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/17/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/09/2009
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/22/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 02/24/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 02/26/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/23/2010