Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/22/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 10/26/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/29/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 01/26/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/27/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/02/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/15/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/15/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/15/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 04/15/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/15/2010
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 04/20/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/26/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/25/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/16/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 06/16/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/30/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/29/2010