There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To extend the commercial space transportation liability regime.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/28/2009Became Public Law No: 111-125. (TXT | PDF)
12/28/2009Signed by President.
12/24/2009Presented to President.
12/23/2009Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S13887)
12/22/2009Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Rockefeller without amendment. Without written report.
10/20/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H11471)
10/15/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
12/28/2009Became Public Law No: 111-125. (TXT | PDF)
12/28/2009Signed by President.
12/24/2009HousePresented to President.
12/24/2009SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/23/2009SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S13887)
12/22/2009SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 249.
12/22/2009SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Rockefeller without amendment. Without written report.
12/17/2009SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
10/21/2009SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
10/20/2009-2:51pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/20/2009-2:51pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H11471)
10/20/2009-2:42pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3819.
10/20/2009-2:42pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H11470-11472)
10/20/2009-2:42pmHouseMr. Gordon (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
10/15/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on Science and Technology.
10/15/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 10/15/2009

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science and Technology10/15/2009 Referred to
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation10/21/2009 Referred to
12/17/2009 Markup by
12/22/2009 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.3819.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.3819. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-125 (12/28/2009)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Extends through calendar 2012 the commercial space transportation liability regime (under which the United States shall pay up to $1.5 billion, adjusted for inflation, in excess of the amount covered by liability insurance or demonstrated financial responsibility with respect to a third party claim against a commercial space launch or reentry licensee, transferee, contractor, subcontractor, or customer for death, bodily injury, or property damage or loss resulting from an activity carried out under the license).

Extends this guarantee to issued or transferred licenses for which the Secretary of Transportation receives a complete and valid application by December 31, 2012 (currently, by December 31, 2009).