Text: H.R.3819 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-125 (12/28/2009)

 
[111th Congress Public Law 125]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]



[[Page 123 STAT. 3486]]

Public Law 111-125
111th Congress

                                 An Act


 
        To extend the commercial space transportation liability 
             regime. <<NOTE: Dec. 28, 2009 -  [H.R. 3819]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,
SECTION 1. COMMERCIAL SPACE TRANSPORTATION LIABILITY REGIME 
                              EXTENSION.

    Section 70113(f) of title 49, United States Code, is amended by 
striking ``December 31, 2009.'' and inserting ``December 31, 2012.''.

    Approved December 28, 2009.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 3819:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 155 (2009):
            Oct. 20, considered and passed House.
            Dec. 23, considered and passed Senate.

                                  <all>