Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/21/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/22/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/22/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/22/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/22/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/22/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/23/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/26/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/26/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/26/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/27/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/28/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/01/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/13/2010