Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 10/15/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 10/15/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 10/15/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 10/15/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 10/29/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/29/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 10/29/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/29/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 11/02/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 12/09/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 12/09/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 12/09/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/11/2010