Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/28/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/03/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/03/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/11/2009