Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/03/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 11/03/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/03/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 11/03/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/16/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/25/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 05/04/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/22/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/22/2010