Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 10/20/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 10/20/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 10/20/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/01/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 03/04/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/04/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/28/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/27/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/29/2010