Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/15/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 01/22/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/03/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/03/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/17/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/30/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/21/2009