Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/22/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/26/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 10/26/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 10/26/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/27/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/27/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 10/27/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/02/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/02/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/02/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/05/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 01/20/2010