Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 10/21/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/20/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 02/22/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/22/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 05/19/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/25/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/25/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/28/2010