Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/07/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/07/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/07/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/07/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/07/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/07/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/07/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/07/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/07/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/07/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/07/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/07/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/07/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/07/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/07/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/07/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 07/07/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/07/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/07/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/07/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/08/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/08/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/08/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/08/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/09/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/09/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/13/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/13/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/13/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/13/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/15/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/15/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/15/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/15/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/15/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/15/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/15/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/16/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/16/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/20/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/21/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/22/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/23/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/23/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/23/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/23/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/23/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/23/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/23/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/24/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/24/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/24/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/24/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/27/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/27/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/28/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/30/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/30/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/30/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/30/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/31/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/31/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/31/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/10/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/10/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/10/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/10/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/10/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/15/2009
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 09/29/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/19/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/01/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/01/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 12/01/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/01/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 12/01/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 12/08/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/08/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/10/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/12/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/26/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/02/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/22/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/22/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/22/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/22/2010
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/22/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/22/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/03/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/03/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/09/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/09/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/15/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/15/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/17/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/17/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/15/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/15/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/26/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 04/26/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/29/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/29/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/24/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/30/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/15/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/28/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/28/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/28/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/23/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/29/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 11/17/2010