Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/27/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/27/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/27/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/27/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/27/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 10/27/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 10/27/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/29/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 10/29/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/02/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 11/02/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 11/02/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/06/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 11/16/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 11/16/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 11/18/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 11/18/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 11/18/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 11/18/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 12/01/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/01/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 12/01/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 12/01/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 12/01/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 12/01/2009
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 12/01/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 12/01/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 12/02/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 12/02/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 12/02/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 12/02/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 12/02/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 12/02/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/02/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 12/03/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 12/03/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 12/03/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 12/03/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 12/10/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/29/2010