There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Pet Safety and Protection Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Animal Welfare Act to ensure that all dogs and cats used by research facilities are obtained legally.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
10/22/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
06/18/2010Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock, Dairy, and Poultry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
10/22/2009Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/22/2009Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E2613)
Action By: House of Representatives
10/22/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (108)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 10/22/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 10/22/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 10/22/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 10/22/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/05/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/05/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/05/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/05/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/05/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/05/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/05/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/05/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/05/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 11/05/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 11/05/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/05/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/05/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 11/05/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/05/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/05/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/05/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 11/05/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/05/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/05/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 11/05/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 11/05/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 11/05/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/05/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/05/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/05/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/05/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 11/05/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/05/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 12/01/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 12/01/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 12/01/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 12/01/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 12/01/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 12/01/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/01/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/01/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/01/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 12/01/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 12/01/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/01/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/01/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 12/01/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/01/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/16/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/16/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 12/16/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 12/16/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 12/16/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/16/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/16/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/22/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 02/22/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/22/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/22/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 02/22/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/22/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 02/22/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 02/22/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/22/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/22/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/22/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/22/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/22/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/22/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/22/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/22/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/22/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/24/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 09/14/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/14/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/29/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/29/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 12/16/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture10/22/2009 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Livestock, Dairy, and Poultry06/18/2010 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3907. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/22/2009)

Pet Safety and Protection Act of 2009 - Amends the Animal Welfare Act to list permissible sources of dogs and cats used by research facilities to include dogs and cats obtained: (1) from a licensed dealer; (2) from a publicly owned and operated pound or shelter that meets specified requirements; (3) by donation from a person who bred and raised the dog or cat or owned it for not less than one year; or (4) from a research facility licensed by the Secretary of Agriculture. Sets forth additional monetary penalties for related violations.

Prohibits federal facilities from purchasing or otherwise acquiring dogs or cats for exhibition purposes (currently, for research, experimentation, or exhibition purposes) except from: (1) the operator of an auction that comports with legal requirements; or (2) a person holding a valid dealer or exhibitor license.

Prohibits dealers from selling or otherwise providing any research facility (currently, any individual or entity) with random source dogs or cats unless specified certification requirements are met.