There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Clean Air Act to provide that greenhouse gases are not subject to the Act, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/09/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
07/23/2009Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mrs. Blackburn. Petition No: 111-5. (Discharge petition text with signatures.)
Action By: House of Representatives
01/14/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/09/2009Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/09/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (154)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 01/27/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/28/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/28/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/28/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 01/28/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 01/28/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 01/28/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/28/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 01/28/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/28/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 01/28/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 01/28/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 01/28/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 01/28/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/28/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/28/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/28/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/28/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/03/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/03/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/03/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/10/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/10/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/10/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 02/10/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 02/10/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 02/12/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 02/25/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 02/25/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/06/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/06/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/12/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/19/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/31/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/04/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/04/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/04/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/06/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/06/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/06/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/12/2009
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/12/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/13/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/20/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/20/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/04/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 06/12/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/26/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/28/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/22/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/22/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/25/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/29/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 10/01/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 10/01/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/01/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 10/01/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/01/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 10/01/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 10/08/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 10/08/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 10/08/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/14/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/15/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/15/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 10/22/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 10/26/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 10/26/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 10/26/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/28/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 10/28/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 10/28/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/28/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/28/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 11/04/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 11/04/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 11/06/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/19/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 12/08/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 12/08/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 12/08/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 12/08/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 12/09/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 12/09/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 12/09/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 12/09/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 12/09/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 12/11/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 12/11/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 12/11/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 12/15/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 12/15/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 12/16/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 12/16/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 12/16/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 12/16/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 12/16/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/16/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 12/16/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/16/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 12/16/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 12/16/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 12/16/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 12/16/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 12/16/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 12/16/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 12/16/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 12/16/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 12/16/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 12/16/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 12/16/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 12/16/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 12/16/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 12/16/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 12/16/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 12/16/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 12/16/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 12/16/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 01/12/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 01/12/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/20/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/04/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/12/2010
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 07/13/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/09/2009 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Environment01/14/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.391.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.391. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/09/2009)

Amends the Clean Air Act to: (1) exclude from the definition of the term "air pollutant" carbon dioxide, water vapor, methane, nitrous oxide, hydrofluorocarbons, perfluorocarbons, or sulfur hexafluoride; and (2) declare that nothing in the Act shall be treated as authorizing or requiring the regulation of climate change or global warming.