Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 10/26/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 10/29/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 11/06/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 11/19/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 11/19/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 12/11/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 12/11/2009
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 12/11/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 12/11/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/14/2010