Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 10/22/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/01/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 12/03/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 12/10/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 12/11/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/11/2010