Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 01/09/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/14/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 01/14/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 01/14/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 01/14/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 01/14/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 01/14/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/14/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/27/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/27/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 01/27/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/27/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/27/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/25/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/25/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/17/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/17/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/17/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/30/2009