Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/27/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 10/27/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/27/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/27/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 10/27/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/28/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/29/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 10/29/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/29/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/29/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 11/04/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/04/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 11/04/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/04/2009