There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Accountability for Business Choices in Iran Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To ensure that companies operating in the United States that receive United States Government funds are not conducting business in Iran, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/23/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
10/23/2009Referred to House Foreign Affairs
Action By: House of Representatives
10/23/2009Referred to House Financial Services
Action By: House of Representatives
10/23/2009Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
Action By: House of Representatives
10/23/2009Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/23/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 10/28/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/28/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/29/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/29/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/03/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/04/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/06/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/18/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/22/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/12/2010

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform10/23/2009 Referred to
House Financial Services10/23/2009 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs10/23/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3922.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3922. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/23/2009)

Accountability for Business Choices in Iran Act - Expresses the sense of Congress that: (1) Iran's illicit nuclear activities as well as development of unconventional weapons and ballistic missiles and support for international terrorism represent a serious threat to the security of the United States and its allies; (2) the United States should continue supporting diplomatic efforts in the International Atomic Energy Agency (IAEA) and the United Nations Security Council (UNSC) to end Iran's illicit nuclear activities; (3) the UNSC should take further measures beyond specified existing UNSC resolutions to tighten sanctions on Iran, including preventing new investment in Iran's energy sector as long as it fails to comply with international demands to halt its nuclear enrichment; and (4) the United States should discourage foreign banks and entities from investing in Iran's energy sector as well as seek to prohibit entities doing business with the United States from doing business with Iran.

Requires the head of each federal agency to ensure that each contract with a company for the procurement of goods and services contains a requirement for the company to certify that it is not conducting business operations in Iran. Defines "business operations" as operations that: (1) provide Iran with refined petroleum resources or technology that could enhance its ability to import or expand its domestic production of such resources; (2) invest $20 million or more in aIran's ability to develop petroleum resources; and (3) provide sensitive technology to Iran.

Authorizes a state or local government to adopt measures to prohibit them from entering into or renewing a contract for the procurement of goods or services with persons included on the List of Parties Excluded from Federal Procurement and Nonprocurement Programs.

Terminates this Act 30 days after: (1) the President certifies to Congress that Iran has ceased support for acts of international terrorism and is no longer considered a state-sponsor of terrorism; and (2) Iran has permanently ceased the pursuit, acquisition, and development of nuclear, biological, and chemical weapons and missiles.