Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 10/23/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 10/28/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/28/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/29/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/29/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/03/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/04/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/06/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/18/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/22/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/12/2010