There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Real Stimulus Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit the Federal Communications Commission from further regulating the Internet.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/26/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
10/27/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications, Technology, and the Internet.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/26/2009Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/26/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 10/29/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/29/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/29/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 10/29/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 10/29/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 10/29/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 10/29/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 10/29/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/29/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/29/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/29/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 10/29/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/29/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 10/29/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/29/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/02/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 11/04/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 11/04/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 11/04/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 11/18/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 12/07/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 04/14/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/14/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/14/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/14/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/22/2010
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/22/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/22/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 04/22/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/29/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/06/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/11/2010
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/11/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/11/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/18/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/18/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/18/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/19/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/26/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/26/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/15/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/15/2010
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 06/21/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 12/22/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce10/26/2009 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications, Technology, and the Internet10/27/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3924. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/26/2009)

Real Stimulus Act of 2009 - Prohibits the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) from proposing, promulgating, or issuing any regulations with regard to the Internet or IP-enabled services.

Makes such prohibition non-applicable to regulations that are determined necessary to: (1) prevent damage to U.S. national security; (2) ensure public safety; or (3) assist or facilitate any actions taken by federal and state law enforcement agencies.