Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 10/26/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 10/26/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 10/26/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 10/26/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 10/26/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 10/26/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 10/26/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 10/26/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 10/26/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/26/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 10/26/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 10/26/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 10/26/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 10/26/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 10/26/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 10/26/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/18/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 11/18/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/18/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 03/04/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/21/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/24/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/24/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/21/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/21/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/20/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/20/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/20/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/20/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/20/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 09/29/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/29/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 09/29/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/29/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 09/29/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/16/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 11/16/2010