There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Preserve Benefits and Jobs Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 and the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to allow time for pensions to fund benefit obligations in light of economic circumstances in the financial markets of 2008, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/27/2009 Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
12/08/2009 Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
10/27/2009 Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
10/27/2009 Referred to House Education and Labor
Action By: House of Representatives
10/27/2009 Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/27/2009 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (56)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 10/27/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/06/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/06/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 11/06/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 11/06/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/06/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 11/06/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/19/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/19/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/03/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 12/10/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 12/10/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/10/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/16/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/20/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 01/20/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 01/20/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 01/27/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 01/27/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 01/27/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/23/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 02/25/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 02/25/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 02/25/2010
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 03/04/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/22/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 03/22/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/22/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 03/22/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/22/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/22/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/22/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/22/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/29/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/29/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/29/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/29/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/06/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/14/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 05/27/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/21/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 06/24/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/15/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/22/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/22/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/22/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/29/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 09/20/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 09/23/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/23/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/29/2010
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Sponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 02/23/2010 04/21/2010

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor10/27/2009 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions12/08/2009 Referred to
House Ways and Means10/27/2009 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

No related bill information was received for H.R.3936.

Subjects (6)

  • Bankruptcy
  • Business investment and capital
  • Employee benefits and pensions
  • Financial services and investments
  • Income tax deductions

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3936. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/27/2009)

Preserve Benefits and Jobs Act of 2009 - Amends the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 (ERISA) and the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) allow a sponsor of a single-employer defined benefit pension plan to elect in 2009 or 2010 extended amortization periods (9 or 15 years) for investment losses incurred in prior years; (2) allow an increase in the valuation range of plan assets; (3) use the funded status of a plan in 2008 to determine benefit restrictions in 2009 and 2010 and prohibit the use of credit balances by pension plans that are under 80% funded in the prior year; (4) exclude plan-related administrative expenses (including investment expenses) from normal cost targets; (5) delay until 2012 the application of certain benefit restrictions to collectively bargained plans; and (6) require a 120% funding target for plans adopting ad hoc amendments that allow lump sum benefits payments and increased plan liabilities.

Revises rules relating to information reporting and reportable events.

Calculates the amount of any pension plan guarantee by the Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation (PBGC) using the date of plan termination rather than the date of a plan bankruptcy filing.

Amends ERISA provisions relating to multiemployer pension plans to: (1) allow such plans to elect alternative amortization plans and valuation methods in 2009 and 2010 for investment losses; (2) extend by five years the funding improvement period for plans in endangered or critical status; (3) permit multiemployer plans to merge or form alliances with other plans; and (4) increase PBGC guarantees for insolvent plans to increase participant benefits.