Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 10/27/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/06/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/06/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 11/06/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 11/06/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/06/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 11/06/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/19/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/19/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/03/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 12/10/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 12/10/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/10/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/16/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/20/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 01/20/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 01/20/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 01/27/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 01/27/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 01/27/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/23/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 02/25/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 02/25/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 02/25/2010
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 03/04/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/22/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 03/22/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/22/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 03/22/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/22/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/22/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/22/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/22/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/29/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/29/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/29/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/29/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/06/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/14/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 05/27/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/21/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 06/24/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/15/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/22/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/22/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/22/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/29/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 09/20/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 09/23/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/23/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/29/2010

Show cosponsors who withdrew