Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 10/27/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 10/27/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 10/27/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 10/27/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 10/27/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 10/27/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 10/27/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 10/27/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 10/27/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 10/27/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 10/27/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 10/27/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 10/27/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 10/27/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 10/27/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 10/27/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 10/27/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 10/27/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/27/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 10/27/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 10/27/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 10/27/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 10/27/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/28/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 10/29/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 11/02/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/02/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/04/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/12/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/22/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/13/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/18/2010