There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To amend Public Law 96-597 to clarify the authority of the Secretary of the Interior to extend grants and other assistance to facilitate political status public education programs for the peoples of the non-self-governing territories of the United States.

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Secretary of the Interior to extend grants and other assistance to facilitate a political status public education program for the people of Guam.

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

To clarify the availability of existing funds for political status education in the Territory of Guam, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
09/30/2010Became Public Law No: 111-244. (TXT | PDF)
09/30/2010Signed by President.
09/30/2010Presented to President.
09/30/2010Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 386 - 5 (Roll no. 565).(text as House agreed to Senate amendments: CR H7361)
09/28/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.
09/28/2010Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.
12/07/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H13533)
12/07/2009Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 111-357.
10/27/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (34)

Date Chamber
09/30/2010Became Public Law No: 111-244. (TXT | PDF)
09/30/2010Signed by President.
09/30/2010HousePresented to President.
09/30/2010-12:25amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/30/2010-12:25amHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 386 - 5 (Roll no. 565). (text as House agreed to Senate amendments: CR H7361)
09/29/2010-10:06pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/29/2010-9:46pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments to H.R. 3940.
09/29/2010-9:46pmHouseMr. Miller, George moved that the House suspend the rules an agree to the Senate amendments. (consideration: CR H7361-7364, H7377)
09/28/2010SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/28/2010SenateS.Amdt.4670 Amendment SA 4670 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/28/2010SenateS.Amdt.4670 Amendment SA 4670 proposed by Senator Durbin for Senator Bingaman. (consideration: CR S7656; text: CR S7656) To amend the title.
09/28/2010SenatePassed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.
09/28/2010SenateS.Amdt.4669 Amendment SA 4669 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/28/2010SenateS.Amdt.4669 Amendment SA 4669 proposed by Senator Durbin for Senator Bingaman. (consideration: CR S7655-7656; text: CR S7655-7656) In the nature of a substitute.
09/28/2010SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7655-7656)
09/28/2010SenateSenate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/19/2010SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
12/08/2009SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
12/07/2009-1:00pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
12/07/2009-1:00pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/07/2009-1:00pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H13533)
12/07/2009-12:56pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3940.
12/07/2009-12:56pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H13533-13534)
12/07/2009-12:56pmHouseMs. Bordallo moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
12/07/2009HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 209.
12/07/2009HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 111-357.
11/18/2009HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
11/18/2009HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
11/18/2009HouseSubcommittee on Insular Affairs, Oceans and Wildlife Discharged.
11/05/2009HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Insular Affairs, Oceans and Wildlife
10/29/2009HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Insular Affairs, Oceans and Wildlife.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
10/27/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
10/27/2009HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E2644)
10/27/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources10/27/2009 Referred to
11/18/2009 Markup by
12/07/2009 Reported by H. Rept. 111-357
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Insular Affairs, Oceans and Wildlife10/29/2009 Referred to
11/05/2009 Hearings by
11/18/2009 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources12/08/2009 Referred to
05/19/2010 Hearings by
09/28/2010 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.3940.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.3940. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-244 (09/30/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on September 28, 2010. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Expresses the sense of Congress that the Secretary of the Interior may provide technical assistance to the government of Guam for public education regarding political status options only if those options are consistent with the U.S. Constitution.

Amends the Fair Minimum Wage Act of 2007 to deny: (1) the Northern Mariana Islands the 2011 increase in its minimum wage; and (2) American Samoa the 2010 and 2011 increase in its minimum wage.

Directs the Government Accountability Office (GAO) to assess the impact of the minimum wage increases for the Northern Mariana Islands and American Samoa and report its findings to Congress by September 1, 2011. Requires the GAO to submit subsequent reports by April 1, 2013, and every two years thereafter until both territory's minimum wage meets the federal minimum wage.