Text: H.R.3940 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-244 (09/30/2010)

 
[111th Congress Public Law 244]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]



[[Page 124 STAT. 2618]]

Public Law 111-244
111th Congress

                                 An Act


 
   To clarify the availability of existing funds for political status 
           education in the Territory of Guam, and for other 
           purposes. <<NOTE: Sept. 30, 2010 -  [H.R. 3940]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,
SECTION 1. SENSE OF CONGRESS REGARDING POLITICAL STATUS EDUCATION 
                              IN GUAM.

    It is the sense of Congress that the Secretary of the Interior may 
provide technical assistance to the Government of Guam under section 
601(a) of the Act entitled ``An Act to authorize appropriations for 
certain insular areas of the United States, and for other purposes'', 
approved December 24, 1980 (48 U.S.C. 1469d(a)), for public education 
regarding political status options only if the political status options 
are consistent with the Constitution of the United States.
SEC. 2. MINIMUM WAGE IN AMERICAN SAMOA AND THE COMMONWEALTH OF THE 
                    NORTHERN MARIANA ISLANDS.

    (a) Delayed Effective Date.--Section 8103(b) of the Fair Minimum 
Wage Act of 2007 (29 U.S.C. 206 note) (as amended by section 520 of 
division D of Public Law 111-117) is amended--
            (1) in paragraph (1)(B), by inserting ``(except 2011 when 
        there shall be no increase)'' after ``thereafter'' the second 
        place it appears; and
            (2) in paragraph (2)(C), by striking ``except that, 
        beginning in 2010'' and inserting ``except that there shall be 
        no such increase in 2010 or 2011 and, beginning in 2012''.

    (b) GAO Report.--Section 8104 of such Act <<NOTE: 121 Stat. 189.>>  
(as amended) is amended--
            (1) by striking subsections (a) and (b) and inserting the 
        following:

    ``(a) Report.--The Government Accountability Office shall assess the 
impact of minimum wage increases that have occurred pursuant to section 
8103, and not later than September 1, 2011, shall transmit to Congress a 
report of its findings. The Government Accountability Office shall 
submit subsequent reports not later than April 1, 2013, and every 2 
years thereafter until the minimum

      

[[Page 124 STAT. 2619]]

 wage in the respective territory meets the federal minimum wage.''; and
            (2) by redesignating subsection (c) as subsection (b).

    Approved September 30, 2010.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 3940:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

HOUSE REPORTS: No. 111-357 (Comm. on Natural Resources).
CONGRESSIONAL RECORD:
                                                        Vol. 155 (2009):
                                    Dec. 7, considered and passed House.
                                                        Vol. 156 (2010):
                                    Sept. 28, considered and passed 
                                        Senate, amended.
                                    Sept. 29, House concurred in Senate 
                                        amendments.

                                  <all>