Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/04/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 11/16/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 11/17/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 12/01/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 12/01/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/08/2009