Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 10/29/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 12/08/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/08/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/19/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/19/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/19/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 01/19/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 01/19/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/19/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/19/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/19/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/27/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/02/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/02/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/02/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/02/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/24/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/15/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/15/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/15/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/15/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/04/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/11/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/11/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/12/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/18/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/18/2010
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/20/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/20/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/20/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/20/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/24/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/27/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/27/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/08/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/08/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/08/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/14/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/16/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/16/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/14/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/14/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/15/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 07/19/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/22/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/29/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/30/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 08/10/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 08/10/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/10/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 08/10/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 08/10/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/14/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/14/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/14/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/14/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/16/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 09/16/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/22/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/29/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/16/2010