Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/18/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 11/18/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/18/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/01/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 12/16/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/13/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/19/2010
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 01/19/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/19/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/19/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 01/20/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/21/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 01/26/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/03/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/03/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/03/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/03/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/03/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/03/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/03/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/25/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/15/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 03/15/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/24/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 03/25/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/13/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/13/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/13/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/15/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/20/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/22/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/26/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/28/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/05/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/06/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/11/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/11/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/13/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/24/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/10/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 06/10/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 09/23/2010