Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/08/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/14/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/12/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/15/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/15/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/15/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/16/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/16/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/22/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/24/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/24/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/20/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/20/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/20/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/28/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/28/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/28/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/28/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/28/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/28/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/04/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/20/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/20/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/28/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/08/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/22/2010