There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 43 Maple Avenue in Shrewsbury, Massachusetts, as the "Ann Marie Blute Post Office".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
06/09/2010Became Public Law No: 111-182. (TXT | PDF)
06/09/2010Signed by President.
06/01/2010Presented to President.
05/25/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4171-4172)
05/18/2010Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
12/10/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 419 - 0 (Roll no. 950).(text: CR 12/8/2009 H13574)
11/04/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
06/09/2010Became Public Law No: 111-182. (TXT | PDF)
06/09/2010Signed by President.
06/01/2010HousePresented to President.
05/25/2010SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/25/2010SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4171-4172)
05/18/2010SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 389.
05/18/2010SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
05/17/2010SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
04/16/2010SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
12/11/2009SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
12/10/2009-2:11pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/10/2009-2:11pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 419 - 0 (Roll no. 950). (text: CR 12/8/2009 H13574)
12/10/2009-2:03pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H14480)
12/08/2009-1:25pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Lynch objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
12/08/2009-1:13pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4017.
12/08/2009-1:13pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H13574-13576)
12/08/2009-1:12pmHouseMr. Lynch moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/18/2009HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
11/18/2009HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
11/04/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
11/04/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform11/04/2009 Referred to
11/18/2009 Markup by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs12/11/2009 Referred to
05/17/2010 Markup by
05/18/2010 Reported by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security04/16/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4017.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4017. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-182 (06/09/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 43 Maple Avenue in Shrewsbury, Massachusetts, as the "Ann Marie Blute Post Office."