Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 11/04/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 11/04/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 11/04/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 11/04/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 11/04/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 11/04/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 11/04/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 11/04/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 11/04/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 11/06/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/06/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 11/16/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 11/16/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 12/01/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/01/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/01/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/16/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/19/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 01/19/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/23/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/23/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/11/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/11/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/11/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/15/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/15/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/15/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/15/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/15/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/15/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/16/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/18/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/18/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/19/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/22/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/24/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/13/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/14/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/18/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/24/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/25/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 07/26/2010