Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 11/06/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 11/06/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 11/06/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 11/07/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 11/07/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 11/16/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 11/17/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 11/18/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 01/26/2010