Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 11/05/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/06/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/06/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 11/06/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/07/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 11/16/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/16/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/16/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 12/01/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/14/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 01/12/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 01/19/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/19/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/27/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/06/2010