Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 11/19/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/01/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/01/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 12/08/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/13/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 01/13/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/19/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/22/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/22/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 03/19/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/06/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/20/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/15/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/15/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/15/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/15/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/29/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/15/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 07/15/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/22/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 08/10/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/15/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 11/15/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 11/15/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/15/2010