Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 11/06/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 11/16/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/16/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/16/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 11/18/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/18/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 02/22/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/24/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/20/2010