Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/18/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 11/18/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/18/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 11/18/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 11/18/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/18/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/01/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 12/01/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 12/01/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 01/27/2010