Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/16/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 11/19/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/21/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/21/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/21/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/21/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 01/21/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 01/21/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 01/21/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/21/2010
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 01/26/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 02/02/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/02/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 02/02/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 02/02/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 02/02/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/03/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/03/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/03/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/04/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/24/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/11/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/11/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/11/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/15/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/15/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/25/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/25/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/25/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 03/25/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 04/20/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/20/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/26/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/12/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 05/26/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/26/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/26/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 06/14/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/17/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/22/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/28/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 12/08/2010