Text: H.R.4052 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/06/2009)


111th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 4052


To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to make certain disaster relief provisions permanent.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

November 6, 2009

Mr. Kind (for himself, Mr. Carnahan, Mr. Davis of Alabama, Mr. Herger, Mr. Melancon, Mr. Paul, and Mr. Tanner) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Ways and Means


A BILL

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to make certain disaster relief provisions permanent.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Fair Disaster Tax Relief Act of 2009”.

SEC. 2. Certain disaster relief provisions made permanent.

(a) Losses.—

(1) IN GENERAL.—Section 165(h)(3)(B)(i)(I) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 is amended by striking “before January 1, 2010”.

(2) LIMITATION ON INDIVIDUAL LOSS PER CASUALTY.—Section 165(h)(1) of such Code is amended by striking “($100 for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2009)”.

(3) EFFECTIVE DATE.—

(A) IN GENERAL.—The amendment made by paragraph (1) shall apply to disasters declared in taxable years beginning after December 31, 2009.

(B) INCREASE IN CASUALTY.—The amendment made by paragraph (2) shall apply to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2009.

(b) Expensing of qualified disaster expenses.—

(1) IN GENERAL.—Section 198A(b)(2)(A) of such Code is amended by striking “occurring before January 1, 2010”.

(2) EFFECTIVE DATE.—The amendment made by paragraph (1) shall apply to amounts paid or incurred after December 31, 2010, in connection with disasters declared after such date.

(c) Net operating losses attributable to Federally declared disasters.—

(1) IN GENERAL.—Section 172(j)(1)(A)(i)(I) of such Code is amended by striking “occurring before January 1, 2010”.

(2) EFFECTIVE DATE.—The amendment made by paragraph (1) shall apply to losses arising in taxable years beginning after December 31, 2009, in connection with disasters declared after such date.

(d) Waiver of certain mortgage revenue bond requirements following federally declared disasters.—

(1) IN GENERAL.—Section 143(k)(12) of such Code is amended—

(A) in subparagraph (A)(i) by striking “occurring before January 1, 2010”, and

(B) in subparagraph (B)(i) by striking “occurring before January 1, 2010,”.

(2) EFFECTIVE DATE.—The amendment made by paragraph (1) shall apply to disasters occurring after December 31, 2009.

(e) Special depreciation allowance for qualified disaster property.—

(1) IN GENERAL.—Section 168(n)(2)(A)(ii)(I) of such Code is amended by striking “occurring before January 1, 2010”.

(2) EFFECTIVE DATE.—The amendment made by paragraph (1) shall apply to property placed in service after December 31, 2009, with respect disasters declared after such date.