Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 11/06/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 12/02/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/26/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/26/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/23/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/25/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/24/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/20/2010