There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Alice Paul Women's Suffrage Congressional Gold Medal Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To award a Congressional Gold Medal in recognition of Alice Paul's role in the women's suffrage movement and in advancing equal rights for women.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/09/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
01/09/2009Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/09/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (139)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/09/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 01/09/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 01/09/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/09/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/15/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/15/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 01/15/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/15/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/15/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 01/15/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 01/15/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/28/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/28/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/28/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/28/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 01/28/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/13/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/13/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/13/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/13/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/13/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/13/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/13/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/13/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/24/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/24/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/24/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/24/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/24/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/24/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 02/24/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/24/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 02/24/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/03/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/03/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/05/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/05/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 03/05/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/05/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/05/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/05/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 03/05/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 03/05/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/11/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/11/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/11/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/11/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/11/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 03/11/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 03/11/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/18/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/18/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 04/01/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/05/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/03/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 06/03/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 06/10/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 06/16/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/16/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/15/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/15/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 07/20/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/21/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/27/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 10/06/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/06/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 10/06/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/06/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 10/06/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 10/06/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 10/14/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/03/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/09/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/21/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/21/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/05/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 06/14/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/14/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services01/09/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.406.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.406. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/09/2009)

Alice Paul Women's Suffrage Congressional Gold Medal Act - Requires the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the President pro tempore of the Senate to make arrangements for the presentation of a congressional gold medal in commemoration of Alice Paul, to recognize her role in the women's suffrage movement and in advancing equal rights for women.

Authorizes the Secretary of the Treasury to strike and sell duplicates in bronze of such medal. Requires proceeds from the sale of such medals to be deposited into the U.S. Mint Public Enterprise Fund.