Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/09/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 01/09/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 01/09/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/09/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/15/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/15/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 01/15/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/15/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/15/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 01/15/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 01/15/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/28/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/28/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/28/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/28/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 01/28/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/13/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/13/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/13/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/13/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/13/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/13/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/13/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/13/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/24/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/24/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/24/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/24/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/24/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/24/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 02/24/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/24/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 02/24/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/03/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/03/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/05/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/05/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 03/05/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/05/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/05/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/05/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 03/05/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 03/05/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/11/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/11/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/11/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/11/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/11/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 03/11/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 03/11/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/18/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/18/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 04/01/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/05/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/03/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 06/03/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 06/10/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 06/16/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/16/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/15/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/15/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 07/20/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/21/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/27/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 10/06/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/06/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 10/06/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/06/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 10/06/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 10/06/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 10/14/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/03/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/09/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/21/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/21/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/05/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 06/14/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/14/2010